judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD A. SHADE v. ALAN VAN LEE LOVELACE, JR., Trustee of The Alan Van Lee Lovelace, Jr. Trust dated February 12, 1997, and MELANIE McILYAR LOVELACE, Trustee of the Melanie McIlyar Lovelace Trust dated April 4, 1997

Case Heading (S-08-0099)
Case Number:S-08-0099Case Docketed On:05/12/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:RICHARD A. SHADE v. ALAN VAN LEE LOVELACE, JR., Trustee of The Alan Van Lee Lovelace, Jr. Trust dated February 12, 1997, and MELANIE McILYAR LOVELACE, Trustee of the Melanie McIlyar Lovelace Trust dated April 4, 1997
Full Title:RICHARD A. SHADE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ALAN VAN LEE LOVELACE, JR., Trustee of The Alan Van Lee Lovelace, Jr. Trust dated February 12, 1997, and MELANIE McILYAR LOVELACE, Trustee of the Melanie McIlyar Lovelace Trust dated April 4, 1997, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard A. ShadeDouglas Fowler
AppelleeAlan Van Lee Lovelace Jr.R. Scott Kath
AppelleeMelanie McIlyar LovelaceR. Scott Kath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/12/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/01/2008Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
07/17/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal