judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AKEISHA STEWART V. JENKINS SECURITY CONSULTANTS

Case Information: 10-AA-1259
Short Caption:AKEISHA STEWART V. JENKINS SECURITY CONSULTANTSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES1824-10Filed Date:10/15/2010

Opening Event Date:10/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/29/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAkeisha Stewart YPro SeN
RespondentJenkins SecurityN
Philip L. Kellogg NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/15/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW(nunc pro tunc)
10/15/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
10/27/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to October 15, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
10/27/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
12/03/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 27, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
12/09/2010LETTER - from the president of the company stat- ing he will represent the company (not an attorney)
12/15/2010APPEARANCE - of Phillip Kellogg on behalf of respondent
05/26/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/9/7/10 hearing
05/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/31/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
07/26/2011FiledOrder directing brief & appendix, accompanied by motion for leave.
09/07/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
09/07/2011FiledDismissed
09/29/2011FiledMandate