judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUCKY GATE RANCH, L.L.C., a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. BAKER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a Nebraska Corporation, and JOHN T. BAKER, an individual

Case Heading (S-08-0096)
Case Number:S-08-0096Case Docketed On:05/09/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:LUCKY GATE RANCH, L.L.C., a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. BAKER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a Nebraska Corporation, and JOHN T. BAKER, an individual
Full Title:LUCKY GATE RANCH, L.L.C., a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BAKER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a Nebraska Corporation, and JOHN T. BAKER, an individual, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLucky Gate Ranch, L.L.C.Michael B. Rosenthal
Matthew Delano Kaufman
Lucas Evan Buckley
AppelleeBaker & Associates, Inc.Richard Alan Mincer
Lindsay Ann Woznick
AppelleeJohn T. BakerRichard Alan Mincer
Lindsay Ann Woznick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Limitation of Actions, Professional negligence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 69
Citation:208 P.3d 57

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/09/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/09/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/30/2008Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
07/08/2008Motion - Reinstatement with attached affidavits.MotionReinstatement of caseFinal
07/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received petition to reinstate appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2008Response/Objection - to motion to reinstate.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' response to appellant's petition to reinstate appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2008Order - Reinstatement. Order granting petition to reinstate appeal.OrderReinstatementFinal
08/28/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/28/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant Lucky Gate Ranch, L.L.C.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellees; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/07/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Lindsay Woznick for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Lucas Buckley for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/17/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court (Lucas Evan Buckley, Michael B. Rosenthal, argument by Mr. Buckley; Richard Alan Mincer, Lindsay Ann Woznick, argument by Ms. Woznick for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/17/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/28/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/15/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/18/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal