judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SUNRISE PARKING GEORGIA AVENUE V. AARON C. WIMBERLY

Case Information: 10-AA-1257
Short Caption:SUNRISE PARKING GEORGIA AVENUE V. AARON C. WIMBERLYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01760-10Filed Date:10/13/2010

Opening Event Date:10/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerSunrise Parking Georgia AvenueNPro SeN
RespondentAaron C. Wimberly NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/13/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECVD ONLY).. No fee or IFP received.
10/15/2010FILING FEE of $100.00
10/15/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
10/22/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Sunrise Parking Georgia Avenue is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
11/29/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
11/29/2010DISMISSED
12/21/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived