judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2686
A-2686
05/04/1950
Application for Writ of Error
H. C. HULETT, ET AL.
WEST LAMAR RURAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/26/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/17/1950Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
05/04/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/26/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/12/1950Opinion issued
06/26/1950Response to Motion filed
06/21/1950Motion to dismiss
06/17/1950Brief on the Merits
06/17/1950Motion for leave to file brief
05/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/04/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/04/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. C. Hulett, et al.Petitioner
West Lamar Rural High School District, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information