judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NUNES VS. NUNES

Case Information: 38228
Short Caption:NUNES VS. NUNESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 99DI1008Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/06/2001 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/24/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Joseph R. Nunes--check no. 1774.
07/24/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12531
08/03/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 01-13158
08/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Peter B. Jaquette--check no. 8144.
08/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 01-13276
08/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired.
08/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/09/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Noel Manoukian.
09/07/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 01-15101
09/11/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Noel Manoukian.
11/28/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-19887
11/28/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-19888
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 01-20981
12/13/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.