judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRAD J. BEAUDRY v. COLLECTION CENTER, INC.; GERALD K. RUSSELL; ROCKY L. EDMONDS, ATTORNEY AT LAW; UNITED MEDICAL CENTER; and BRIAN J. HANIFY, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Case Heading (S-08-0097)
Case Number:S-08-0097Case Docketed On:05/09/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:BRAD J. BEAUDRY v. COLLECTION CENTER, INC.; GERALD K. RUSSELL; ROCKY L. EDMONDS, ATTORNEY AT LAW; UNITED MEDICAL CENTER; and BRIAN J. HANIFY, ATTORNEY AT LAW
Full Title:BRAD J. BEAUDRY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. COLLECTION CENTER, INC.; GERALD K. RUSSELL; ROCKY L. EDMONDS, ATTORNEY AT LAW; UNITED MEDICAL CENTER; and BRIAN J. HANIFY, ATTORNEY AT LAW, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrad J. Beaudry Pro Se
AppelleeCollection Center, Inc.Gerald K. Russell
Rocklon L. Edmonds
AppelleeGerald K. RussellRocklon L. Edmonds
AppelleeRocklon L. Edmonds Pro Se
AppelleeUnited Medical CenterBrian Joseph Hanify
AppelleeBrian Joseph Hanify Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/09/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/09/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/20/2008Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
05/27/2008Brief - Appellant (not proper brief)BriefAppellantFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - received "The Fourteenth Amendment and State's Rights" from appellant. No action taken.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/05/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/20/2008Event - Other - State Trooper came and copied file, including document received this date "Last Rights of Brad J. Beaudry". He had been contacted by the Governor's office regarding the document. He was going to visit Mr. Beaudry.EventOtherFinal