judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NESTOR DJONKAM, ET AL V. DC BD OF ELECTIONS & ETHICS

Case Information: 10-AA-1258
Short Caption:NESTOR DJONKAM, ET AL V. DC BD OF ELECTIONS & ETHICSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd Elections & Ethics (BEE)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:011-10Filed Date:10/14/2010

Opening Event Date:10/14/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/07/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerNestor Djonkam NPro SeN
PetitionerGeorge Jackson NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Board of Elections & EthicsN
Kenneth J. McGhieNN
Rudolph M.D. McGannNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/14/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/14/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/14/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL (to reverse decision)dwm LW
10/14/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Kenneth J. McGhie, Esq.
10/21/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/22/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion for summary reversal
11/15/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED. It is ****MORE****
11/15/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli INc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979). SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
11/15/2010 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on apepal IS HEREBY AFFIRMED. (RDBRNW) (jl)
12/07/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived