judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CYNTHIA HALL V. SIDNEY REDMOND HALL

Case Information: 10-FM-1251
Short Caption:CYNTHIA HALL V. SIDNEY REDMOND HALLClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB39-10Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/21/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCynthia Hall YPro SeN
AppelleeSidney Redmond Hall N
Jay B. Dorsey NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 29, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
11/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 5/13/10 5/24/10 5/26/10 6/2/10 6/25/10 (rt. needed)
11/18/2010RECEIVED- aplt's motion for appeal transcript
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (95 pgs/tape) 5/13/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (27 pgs/tape) 5/24/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (113 pgs/tape) 5/26/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (59 pgs/tape) 6/25/10 proc. w/cd
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
03/03/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 11, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
03/30/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
03/30/2011DISMISSED
04/21/2011MANDATE ISSUED
04/21/2011MANDATE ISSUED