judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRADY VS. SSDS LIQUIDATING

Case Information: 38220
Short Caption:BRADY VS. SSDS LIQUIDATINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A425694Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/16/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Craig D Burr, Esq.--check no. 2638.
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12471
07/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days.
08/07/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested:May 29, 2001. To Court Reporter: James Helleso. 01-13287
08/08/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-13376
08/14/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Joint Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. 01-13781
08/15/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. on respondent Craig Carstensen. Due date: 10 days.
08/15/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Supplemental Request) Transcripts requested: 5/29/01. To Court Reporter: James Helleso. 01-13887
08/22/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. on respondent Craig Carstensen. (Served on Carstensen c/o attorney Daniel Markoff.) 01-14217
08/23/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 29, 2001. Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. 01-14337
10/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. It appears under the circumstances described above that Craig Carstensen is not a respondent to appellants' appeal. Appellants shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, show cause why Craig Carstensen should not be removed from the court's caption as a respondent. In the event appellants conclude that Mr. Carstensen is a respondent to their appeal, they shall, within this dame time period, provide the clerk of this court with a current mailing address for Mr. Carstensen. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner shall result in the removal of Craig Carstensen as a respondent to this appeal. 01-16656
11/14/2001Other Other. Removed Craig Carstensen as a proper person respondent per 10/03/01 order.
11/16/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/08/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 30 days for further negotiations. 02-02575
05/15/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: negotiations are continuing towards resolustion for about 30 days. 02-08527
05/16/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: negotiations are continuing towards potential settlement. 02-08682
05/28/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-09334
06/24/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellants shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 02-10841
06/27/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-11059
07/19/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 02-12408
07/19/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.