judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LORENZO S. MONTEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0089)
Case Number:S-08-0089Case Docketed On:04/21/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:LORENZO S. MONTEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LORENZO S. MONTEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLorenzo S. MontezMichael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel
Opinion Number:2009 WY 17
Citation:201 P.3d 434

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/21/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/06/2008Motion - Other - motion to withdraw as counsel.MotionOtherFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Michael H. Reese on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2008Order - Granting leave for counsel to withdraw (Public Defender allowed to withdraw)OrderGrantFinal
06/09/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief - AppellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/09/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/24/2008Brief - Appellant - removed by court order.BriefAppellantFinal
07/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received- Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/04/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/26/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts, CD, Disk, & Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/26/2008Order - Other - Order requesting replacement brief of appellant.OrderOtherFinal
10/01/2008Brief - Appellant (replacement brief requested by court. Removed brief of appellant filed on 7/24/08.)BriefAppellantFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael Reese for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2008Order - Other - Emergency Order Allowing Four Justices to Hear Oral ArgumentOrderOtherFinal
11/19/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Kite and Hill (Michael H. Reese for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/12/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/02/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/02/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/04/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for, no date filled in.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/15/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received request from appellant to have copies of legal documents sent to Defender Aid Program.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/15/2009Correspondence - Outgoing - response to letter requesting copies, cc to Defender Aid.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal