Case Information: 10-FM-1252 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMAS HOBGOOD V. CHRISTOPHER REBMAN | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CPO2544-10 | Filed Date: | 10/08/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/08/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 01/03/2011 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Thomas Hobgood | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Christopher Rebman | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
10/08/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
11/18/2010 | ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index/or record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11(b((#)(A). (JAC) | |||
12/06/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL | |||
12/07/2010 | RECORD INDEX | |||
12/10/2010 | ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL without prejudice. See D.C. App. R. 13(b). (ETW) | |||
12/10/2010 | DISMISSED | |||
01/03/2011 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
01/03/2011 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
04/17/2014 | Filed | Archived |