judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ROBERT G. CONDRA, ET AL. v. GROGAN MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Case: A-2690
A-2690
05/08/1950
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT G. CONDRA, ET AL.
GROGAN MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/08/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/22/1950Response to PetitionPetitioner
05/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/10/1950Response to Motion filed
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/25/1950Dissenting opinion issued.
10/25/1950Opinion issued
07/08/1950Response to Petition
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1950Response to Petition
05/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/08/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert G. Condra, et al.Petitioner
Grogan Manufacturing CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information