Case Information: 38215 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF DUNCAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/23/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/23/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 & 2. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-12441 | |
07/23/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. | ||
01/08/2002 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Bar Discipline Order. "Duncan is disbarred." In addition, Duncan shall reimburse the full amount of all retainers paid by the clients described in the complaints, and shall pay the costs of the disciplinary proceedings. Duncan and the state bar shall comply with the notice requirements of SCR 115. EN BANC. | 02-00425 | |
01/29/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Service by Mail and Notice of Order to Public. | 02-01933 | |
02/01/2002 | Other | Other. Received returned certified mail addressed to Dwight E. Duncan (containing a copy of the order filed 01/08/02) as Unclaimed. | ||
02/05/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. | 02-00712 | |
02/05/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/09/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 5, 2003. | 02-00712 |