judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD B. OSBORN v. RUSSELL and SHEILA KILTS, husband and wife, and RONALD KELLY

Case Heading (S-08-0083)
Case Number:S-08-0083Case Docketed On:04/11/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:RICHARD B. OSBORN v. RUSSELL and SHEILA KILTS, husband and wife, and RONALD KELLY
Full Title:RICHARD B. OSBORN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. RUSSELL and SHEILA KILTS, husband and wife, and RONALD KELLY, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard B. Osborn Pro Se
AppelleeRussell KiltsRick L. Koehmstedt
Peter James Timbers
AppelleeSheila KiltsRick L. Koehmstedt
Peter James Timbers
AppelleeRonald D. KellyScott W. Meier
Lucas Evan Buckley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/23/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/02/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/10/2008Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss appealResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/11/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/18/2008Order - Dismiss - involuntary and certifying no reasonable cause for appealOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
07/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs -verified statement of attorney's feesNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/07/2008Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
07/11/2008Motion - Strike attorney's feesMotionStrikeFinal
07/15/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs as sanctionOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
07/15/2008Order - Deny - ReinstatementOrderDenyFinal
07/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal