judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8722
B-8722
08/09/1979
Application for Writ of Error
MISSOURI-KANSAS-TEXAS RAILROAD COMPANY
CRAIG B. MAY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/10/1980Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/30/1979Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/27/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
08/09/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/14/1980Response to Motion filed
04/10/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/02/1980Opinion issued
11/30/1979Reply to Response
08/27/1979Response to Petition
08/09/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/09/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Craig B. MayRespondent
Missouri-Kansas-Texas Railroad CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information