judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8693
B-8693
07/27/1979
Application for Writ of Error
LONI ROWE DAVIS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF LISA ROWER AND STEPHEN ROWE, DEPPY DEWITT JACQUESS
DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS AND DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/04/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/06/1979Supplement to ResponseRespondent
08/20/1979Amended PetitionPetitioner
08/02/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/27/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/16/1979Response to Motion filed
10/04/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/06/1979Supplement to Response
08/24/1979Response to Motion filed
08/22/1979Motion to amend application for writ of errorFiling granted
08/20/1979Amended Petition
08/10/1979Miscellaneous Motion
08/02/1979Response to Petition
07/27/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/27/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dairyland County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas and Dairyland Insurance CompanyRespondent
Loni Rowe Davis, individually and as Next Friend of Lisa Rower and Stephen Rowe, Deppy Dewitt JacquessPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information