judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE DISCIPLINARY MATTER OF STUART H. GREENE, D.C., LICENSE NUMBER 366, STUART H. GREENE, D.C. v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING BOARD OF CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS

Case Heading (S-08-0137)
Case Number:S-08-0137Case Docketed On:06/27/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Professions and Occupations (Title 33)
Short Title:IN THE DISCIPLINARY MATTER OF STUART H. GREENE, D.C., LICENSE NUMBER 366, STUART H. GREENE, D.C. v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING BOARD OF CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS
Full Title:IN THE DISCIPLINARY MATTER OF STUART H. GREENE, D.C., LICENSE NUMBER 366, STUART H. GREENE, D.C., Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING BOARD OF CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStuart H. Greene D.C.William G. Hibbler
AppelleeWyoming Board of Chiropractic ExaminersBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Kennard F. Nelson
Ryan T. Schelhaas

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 42
Citation:204 P.3d 285 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/27/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/08/2008Motion - Stay - other. Motion for continued stay of disciplinary suspension pursuant to 12.05, W.R.A.P.MotionStay - otherFinal
07/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for continued stayEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2008Order - Other. Order granting motion for stay of disciplinary suspension. (Disciplinary suspension imposed by the Wyoming Board of Chiropractic Examiners stayed during pendency of this appeal with conditions.)OrderOtherFinal
08/08/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/23/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/23/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Hibbler for appellant; and Kennard F. Nelson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/17/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court. (William G. Hibbler for appellant; Kennard F. Nelson, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/17/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/25/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/13/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/13/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal