judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DON PADOU, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.

Case Information: 10-AA-1298
Short Caption:DON PADOU, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Alcohol Beverage Control Board (ABC)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PRO-97-10Filed Date:10/25/2010

Opening Event Date:10/25/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/24/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/19/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDon Padou NPro SeN
PetitionerAbigail Padou NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/25/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/25/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/25/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
11/24/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/ hearing of 2/28/07
11/24/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioners' brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
12/08/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days
12/15/2010NOTICE RECEIVED that motion to extend the brfing schd filed 12/8/09 is consented to by the Resp.
12/21/2010 On consideration of petitioners' motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioners' brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before February 10, 2011. (JAC)
02/10/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
02/10/2011APPENDIX
03/17/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 30 days
03/21/2011PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION- to respondent's motion for enlargement of time to file respondent's brief
03/30/2011ORDER GRANT RESP MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the brief of respondetn shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (ETW)
04/18/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and stay briefing schedule
04/20/2011TMC - motion to dismiss... - oppo - reply
05/02/2011PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION LW
05/11/2011RESPONDENT'S REPLY - to petitioner's response to respondent's motion to dismiss
06/02/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS, THE OPPOSITION and the REPLY thereto are HEREBY REFERRED TO THE MERITS DIVISION, ONCE ASSIGNED. It is ****MORE****
06/02/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO STAY THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that RESPONDENT shall file the brief w/n 30 days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners' reply brief, if any shall be filed w/n 21 days after service of respondent's brief. (FIBEKG)
06/23/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 2 weeks
07/05/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before July 19, 2011. (JAC)
07/07/2011FiledPTNR MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF to 9/15/11. no oppo
07/19/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
07/19/2011FiledBriefing Completed
07/25/2011FiledOrder Granting PTNR MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF to 9/15/11. no oppo
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/27/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Petitioner Padou)
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/26/2012VacatedOrder Denying respondent's motion to dismiss appeal.
02/01/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Petitioner Padou)
02/06/2012FiledOrder vacating 1/26/12 order
02/17/2012FiledSuggestion of mootness (Respondent)
02/22/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Fisher, Belson Don Padou, Pro Se for petitioner Holly M. Johnson, Esq. for respondent
03/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
04/11/2012FiledMandate