judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE (RUSSELL) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 33438
Short Caption:WHITE (RUSSELL) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - HC1267Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/08/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00295
01/14/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1 [We consolidate these appeals for resolution.] Appellant's counsel in Docket No. 30865 informs us that appellant died on December 16, 1998. Judgment: "ORDER these appeals dismissed." Nos. 30865, 33438 99-00264
02/09/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-00888
02/09/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/22/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 17, 1999. 99-00888