judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8710
B-8710
08/02/1979
Application for Writ of Error
QUINCY LEE COMPANY, ROYAL CREST, INC., AND TEXAS CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY
LODAL AND BAIN ENGINEERS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/03/1980Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/15/1980Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/29/1980Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/28/1980Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/24/1979Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/17/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
08/02/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/31/1980Miscellaneous Motion
07/03/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/18/1980Opinion issued
04/07/1980Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7
02/15/1980Reply to Response
01/29/1980Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/28/1980Brief on the Merits
11/21/1979Document received (See Remarks)
11/21/1979Document received (See Remarks)
11/21/1979Document received (See Remarks)
11/21/1979Document received (See Remarks)
08/24/1979Reply to Response
08/17/1979Response to Petition
08/04/1979Document received (See Remarks)
08/02/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lodal and Bain Engineers, Inc.Respondent
Quincy Lee Company, Royal Crest, Inc., and Texas Central Mortgage CompanyPetitioner
Texas Society of Professional EngineersAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information