judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8720
B-8720
08/09/1979
Application for Writ of Error
DR. GERALD L. HURST
RICHARD W. FORSYTHE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/01/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/27/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
08/09/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/07/1979Response to Motion filed
11/01/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/27/1979Response to Petition
08/19/1979Document received (See Remarks)
08/09/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richard W. ForsytheRespondent
Dr. Gerald L. HurstPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information