judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8727
B-8727
08/13/1979
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS SKATING ASSOCIATION, LUTHER BERNSTEIN AND ERNEST L. PRUETT, ESCOBEDO ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA BRIDGEPORT BALLROOM
BOB BULLOCK, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS. ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/22/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
08/21/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
08/13/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/13/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/10/1979Response to Motion filed
12/06/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/22/1979Response to Petition
08/21/1979Response to Petition
08/13/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/13/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/13/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Skating Association, Luther Bernstein and Ernest L. PruettPetitioner
Bob Bullock, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas. et al.Respondent
Escobedo Enterprises, Inc. dba Bridgeport BallroomPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information