Case Information: 56660 | |||
Short Caption: | IBARRA (HECTOR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 08C250152-2 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/01/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/24/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived | ||
08/24/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-21675 | |
09/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. Notice of Appeal Log due: 30 days. | 10-22631 | |
09/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order Regarding Prison Log. | 10-24324 | |
09/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Allowing Appeal to Proceed and Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 60 days. | 10-24643 | |
11/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/01/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | 10-28556 | |
11/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Presentence Investigation (PSI) Report. (SEALED). | 10-28914 | |
02/10/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Due: 40 days. | 11-04377 | |
03/15/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Supplemental Record on Appeal. | 11-07894 | |
03/25/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record. Due 40 days. | 11-09180 | |
05/03/2011 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 1/26/09. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | ||
05/03/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/26/09. | 11-13050 | |
05/06/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/10/08 and 12/15/05. | 11-13507 | |
05/06/2011 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/10/08 and 12/15/08. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. | ||
05/10/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (Supplemental) | 11-13867 | |
07/15/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-21366 | |
08/12/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-24485 | |
08/12/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/23/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2011. | 11-24485 |