Case Information: 33437 | |||
Short Caption: | MILES (EDWARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35126 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150836 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/07/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/07/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00284 | |
12/14/1998 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 98-00367 | |
12/21/1998 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: trial--9/14/98 to 9/2/98. To Court Reporters: Debra Winn and Cathy Nelson. | 98-00457 | |
02/01/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due: 30 days. | 99-00672 | |
02/08/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 12/8/98. | 99-00861 | |
02/25/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 09/16/98; 09/17/98; 09/18/98; 09/21/98; and 09/22/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. | 99-01280 | |
03/31/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 3, 1999. | 99-02370 | |
04/30/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time. | 99-03460 | |
06/25/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We temporarily stay the briefing schedule in this appeal. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a motion in this court for a remand accompanied by appropriate documentation. fn1[If, following a remand from this court, the district court grants appellant's motion and resentences appellant, appellant must file a new, timely notice of appeal from the amended judgment of conviction in order to properly vest jurisdiction in this court to review any appeal from the amended judgment. | 99-05604 | |
07/06/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Remand to District Court for Re-Sentencing. | 99-05893 | |
09/14/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. On July 6, 1999, appellant filed a motion to remand this appeal to the district court for resentencing. The state does not oppose appellant's motion. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court for a new sentencing proceeding based upon a psychosexual evaluation of appellant by a duly qualified person." This order constitutes this court's final disposition of this appeal and is enterd without prejudice to appellant's right to challenge his conviction and sentence after resentencing by the filing of a timely notice of appeal from the district court's entry of the amended judgment of conviction. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 99-08638 | |
10/12/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-09825 | |
10/12/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/08/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 27, 1999. | 99-09825 |