Case Information: 10-AA-1297 | |||
Short Caption: | KAREN L. JANCZY V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS. | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation |
Lead: | 10-AA-1287 | Consolidated: | 10-AA-1297 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CRB086-08 | Filed Date: | 10/22/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/22/2010 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 11/19/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/29/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/27/2011 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 02/16/2012 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Intervenor | Georgetown University Hospital | N |
| |||||||||
Intervenor | Sedgwick Cms | N |
| |||||||||
Petitioner | Karen L. Janczy | N |
| |||||||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp. | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
10/22/2010 | PETITION FOR REVIEW | |||
10/22/2010 | FILING FEE of $100.00. | |||
10/25/2010 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq. | |||
11/19/2010 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
11/19/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
01/12/2011 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE w/10aa 1287 | |||
01/20/2011 | ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE Upon consideration of the notices of appeal filed in these matters, and it appearing that petitioners' brief has been filed in no. 10-AA-1287, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-AA-1287 and 10-AA-1297 are consolidated for al purposes herein. It is (MORE) | |||
01/20/2011 | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Karen L. Janczy as an intervenor in petition no. 10-AA-1287. It is (MORE) | |||
01/20/2011 | F/O that, in petition for review no. 10-AA-1297, petitioner's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30(a)(1), shall be filed witin 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's consolidated brief and intervenor's brief in petition for review no. 10-AA-1287 shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (ETW) | |||
01/25/2011 | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE - by Georgetown University Hospital and Sedgwick CMS (10-AA-1297) | |||
02/02/2011 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Karen Janczy) no oppo to 3/1/11 | |||
02/15/2011 | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Georgetown University Hospital and Sedgwick CMS as intervenors in appeal no. 10-AA-1297. It is | |||
02/15/2011 | ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that the consolidated brief (opening brief in 10-AA-1297) and response brief in 10-AA-1287) shall be filed on or before March 1, 2011. It is F/O that the briefs of respondent and intervenors Georgetown University Hospital and Sedgwick CMS shall be filed on or before March 31, 2011. (ETW) | |||
03/01/2011 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF - (Karen Janczy) (opening brief 10-AA-1297 & response brief 10-AA-1287) | |||
03/09/2011 | MEMORANDUM/STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF (D.C.) | |||
03/29/2011 | INTERVENOR'S BRIEF filed by. William Hopkins (BI for both Georgetown Univ. Hospital and Sedgwick CMS per Mr. Hopkins)- dlm | |||
03/29/2011 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
04/08/2011 | Filed | Final Screening-Summary | ||
09/01/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
09/12/2011 | Filed | Motion for Oral Argument (Petitioner Georgetown University Hospital) | ||
09/27/2011 | Filed | Order Denying petitioner, Georgetown Univ. Hospital motion for oral argument. | ||
10/27/2011 | Filed | Submitted to Judges Oberly, Ruiz, King | ||
01/25/2012 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Oberly, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and King, Senior Judge.) | ||
02/16/2012 | Filed | Mandate |