judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5994
A-5994
08/14/1956
Application for Writ of Error
JAS. F. NEECE
A.A.A. REALTY COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/30/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/17/1956Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/06/1956Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/22/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
08/14/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/06/1957Opinion issued
02/04/1957Response to Motion filed
01/30/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/16/1957Opinion issued
12/17/1956Supplemental Brief filed
12/06/1956Brief on the Merits
11/14/1956Document received (See Remarks)
08/29/1956Additional Copies received
08/22/1956Response to Petition
08/14/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/14/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A.A.A. Realty Company, Inc.Respondent
Jas. F. NeecePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information