judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO KNIGHT

Case Information: 33428
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO KNIGHTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D223889Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Karen A. Connolly--check no. 2004.
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00267
12/14/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Karen A. Connolly. She represented appellant at trial. Attorney Jeff Cogan was appointed to represent her on appeal. (Docket sheet changed and docketing statement mailed to attorney Cogan.) 98-00383
01/06/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00067
01/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-01448
02/11/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. 00-02240
03/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 7, 1998, we docketed Susan Knight's appeal. On January 28, 2000, respondent file a motion to dismiss the appeals of Susan Knight and Ronald Stanley Knight. Paul M. Gaudet, has filed an opposition to the motion to dismiss on behalf of Mr. Knight. We direct the district court clerk to immediately transmit to this court a copy of Mr. Knight's notice of appeal together with the other documents required pursuant to NRAP 3(e). fn1[The clerk of this court shall modify the caption by adding Ronald Stanley Knight as an appellant in this matter and shall file the documents to be transmitted by the district court clerk in this appeal.] We decline to dismiss these appeals from a district court order terminating parental rights. Attorney Gaudet and Cogan shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them for their failure to prosecute this appeal in a timely manner. Appellants shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, fully comply with NRAP 9. fn3[The clerk shall, forthwith, send attorney Gaudet a docketing statement. Gaudet shall, within 15 days of this order, comply with NRAP 14.] Appellants shall, within 50 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendices. Briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(2). (Docketing statement mailed to attorney Gaudet). 00-04299
03/23/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. for Ronald Stanley Knight. 00-04638
03/23/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. (Counsel appointed for Ronald Stanley Knight.)
04/04/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-05419
04/04/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 9, 1998. To Court Reporter: Department D. 00-05420
04/04/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-05442
04/04/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response of Counsel to Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed; Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. 00-05444
04/04/2000Other Other. Filed Case Appeal Statement. (Not filed in district court.) 00-05446
05/11/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Susan Knight's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 5/9/00. 00-07807
05/11/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Returned Unfiled with notice. Corrected appendix due: 10 days.
05/24/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant Susan Knight. 00-08690
05/30/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. To Appellant Susan Knight's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 5/26/00. 00-09036
08/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Failure to Pay Deposit for Transcripts from court reporter Deborah Casper. 00-14910
08/29/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 10, 2000, appellant Susan Knight submitted to this court a document entitled 'Joinder to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal.' Because this document was not timely submitted it was not filed. In the interest of judicial efficiency, the clerk of this court shall forthwith file the document submitted to this court on March 10, 2000. fn1[We denied respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal in our order of March 17, 2000.] On April 4, 2000, appellant Ronald Knight filed a case appeal statement with this court. We waive, for this appeal only, the requirement that the case appeal statement be filed in the district court. On April 4, 2000, Paul M. Gaudet, counsel for appellant Ronald Knight, filed a 'Response of Counsel to Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed; Motion to Withdraw As Attorney of Record.' We conclude that sanctions are not warranted against attorney Gaudet. Because attorney Gaudet was appointed by the district court to represent appellant Ronald Knight in this appeal, we deny attorney Gaudet's motion to withdraw. On April 4, 2000, Jeffrey A. Cogan, counsel for appellant Susan Knight, also filed a response to this court's March 17, 2000, show cause order. We conclude that sanctions are not warranted against attorney Cogan. On April 4, 2000, appellant Susan Knight filed a transcript request form requesting the preparation of transcripts for proceedings held on October 9, 1998. Unless appellant Susan Knight informs this court otherwise in a writing submitted within 10 days from the date of this order, this court will assume that the transcripts requested by appellant Susan Knight are unnecessary for this court's review of this appeal. 00-15191
08/29/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-03828
09/08/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Notice of Request for Transcripts. Transcripts requested: October 9, 1998. To Court Reporter: Transcriber's Office of the Eighth Judicial District Court. 00-15827
10/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that appellant Susan Knight believes that the transcripts of October 9, 1998, are necessary for our review of this appeal. However, on August 24, 2000, court reporter Deborah Casper filed a notice stating that appellant had failed to pay the deposit for the requested transcripts. Accordingly, appellant Susan Knight shall pay the required deposit within 10 days of the date of this order and file proof of such payment with the clerk of this court. Upon payment of the deposit, Casper shall prepare and file the requested transcripts within 30 days. Should appellant no longer wish to have these transcripts prepared, she shall inform this court and court reporter Casper within 10 days of the date of this order. To date , appellant Susan Knight has failed to file a reply brief. We treat this as an election not to file a reply brief. Accordingly, briefing is completed in this appeal as to Susan Knight., To date, appellant Ronald Knight has not filed the opening brief. Appellant Ronald Knight shall file his opening brief and appendix within 10 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply may result in the immediate dismissal of his appeal as abandoned. 00-17625
10/17/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Ronald Stanley Knight's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 10/16/00. 00-18370
10/17/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant Ronald Stanley Knight. 00-18371
10/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice Regarding Transcripts. Appellant submits that the transcripts are unnecessary for the review of this appeal. 00-18479
10/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 18, 2000, appellant filed a notice regarding transcripts stating that 'the transcripts are unnecessary.' We vacate that portion of our order entered on October 4, 2000, requiring appellant to pay the deposit for the transcripts of proceedings conducted on October 9, 1998. We deem all transcripts necessary for this appeal to be filed with this court. We admonish appellant Susan Knight's counsel for including in the transcript request form dates for which no transcripts were required. 00-18836
10/26/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Inter-department mail, no date. 00-18913
10/30/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Paul M. Gaudet. 00-19053
11/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-20545
11/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-1 (CY/RR/NB).
02/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "AFFIRM the order of the district court terminating the parental rights of Ronald S.K. and Susan K. as to their children." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-02455
03/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02579
03/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. 01-02579