judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIVERVIEW HEIGHTS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, & RIVERVIEW HEIGHTS HOMEOWNERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. CHRISTOPHER L. RISLOV, an individual, WYOMING RENOVATIONS, INC., d/b/a FAIRGROUND HOMES, a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-08-0126)
Case Number:S-08-0126Case Docketed On:06/11/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:RIVERVIEW HEIGHTS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, & RIVERVIEW HEIGHTS HOMEOWNERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. CHRISTOPHER L. RISLOV, an individual, WYOMING RENOVATIONS, INC., d/b/a FAIRGROUND HOMES, a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:RIVERVIEW HEIGHTS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, & RIVERVIEW HEIGHTS HOMEOWNERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CHRISTOPHER L. RISLOV, an individual, WYOMING RENOVATIONS, INC., d/b/a FAIRGROUND HOMES, a Wyoming corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRiverview Heights Homeowners' AssociationKelly A. Rudd
AppellantRiverview Heights Homeowners, Inc., a Wyoming corporationKelly A. Rudd
AppelleeChristopher L. RislovPeter C. Nicolaysen
Pamala M. Brondos
AppelleeWyoming Renovations, Inc., d/b/a Fairground Homes, a Wyoming corporationPeter C. Nicolaysen
Pamala M. Brondos

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2009 WY 55
Citation:205 P.3d 1035

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/29/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/30/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/12/2008Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
09/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/30/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received - appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/09/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Errata from counsel for appellantsNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kelly Rudd for appellant; Peter Nicolaysen for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kelly A. Rudd for appellants; Peter C. Nicolaysen for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/21/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/07/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/8/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal