judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6029
A-6029
09/10/1956
Application for Writ of Error
A. M. MULDROW, SECRETARY OF STATE
TEXAS FROZEN FOODS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/08/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/12/1956Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/29/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
09/28/1956Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
09/10/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/08/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/27/1957Opinion issued
12/12/1956Supplemental Brief filed
11/21/1956Document received (See Remarks)
09/29/1956Response to Petition
09/28/1956Brief in Support of Petition
09/15/1956Motion to dismissOverruled
09/10/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/10/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Frozen Foods, Inc.Respondent
A. M. Muldrow, Secretary of StatePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information