judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6028
A-6028
09/10/1956
Application for Writ of Error
EDDINS-WALCHER BUTANE COMPANY
ROBERT S. CALVERT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/06/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/28/1956Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/21/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
09/10/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/16/1957Response to Motion filed
02/06/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/23/1957Opinion issued
11/28/1956Brief on the Merits
10/17/1956Document received (See Remarks)
09/21/1956Response to Petition
09/10/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/10/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert S. Calvert, et al.Respondent
Eddins-Walcher Butane CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information