judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6010
A-6010
08/24/1956
Application for Writ of Error
OWEN DEVELOPMENT COMPANY
ROY CALVERT AND F.A. COTEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/08/1957Supplemental Brief filedRespondentRespondents' Supplemental Brief and Written Argument
09/04/1956Response to PetitionRespondentAnswer to Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of Roy Calvert and F.A. Cotey by attorney Ben Johnson
08/24/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerPetition for Writ of Error filed on behalf of Owen Development Company
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/22/1957Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedOpinion of the Court delivered by Justice Smith
03/08/1957Supplemental Brief filedRespondents' Supplemental Brief and Written Argument
01/30/1957Case Record Filed Record from Court of Appeals
01/30/1957Transcript receivedTranscript from the 7th Judicial District Court of Smith County; Court# 22,434-A
09/04/1956Response to PetitionAnswer to Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of Roy Calvert and F.A. Cotey by attorney Ben Johnson
08/24/1956Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.Opinion of the Court of Appeals issued June 21, 1956 issued by Associate Justice Matt Davis
08/24/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetition for Writ of Error filed on behalf of Owen Development Company
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
Smith