judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6027
A-6027
09/10/1956
Application for Writ of Error
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
L. S. JACKSON, DBA HUB MOTOR LINES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/05/1957Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
02/21/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/01/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
09/10/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/19/1957Response to Motion filed
03/05/1957Brief in Support of Petition
02/21/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/06/1957Opinion issued
11/21/1956Document received (See Remarks)
10/01/1956Response to Petition
09/10/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/10/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L. S. Jackson, dba Hub Motor Lines, et al.Respondent
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information