Case Information: 33427 | |||
Short Caption: | VADER (MICHEAL) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 19846 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/11/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/04/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/04/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 98-00265 | |
01/21/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to file Respondent's Answering Brief. | 99-00430 | |
02/01/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. | 99-00671 | |
03/01/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief. | 99-01366 | |
03/08/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person, and thus the opening brief was received and not filed. It appears that counsel for the state is proceeding under the assumption that she must file an answering brief. We deny the state's motions for extensions to file the answering brief. This does not preclude the state from responding to appellant's opening brief. If the state still wishes to file an answering brief, the state may resubmit a motion to extend the time. | 99-01588 | |
05/11/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. Mailed on 5/7/99. | 99-03791 | |
05/11/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/22/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-03300 | |
03/20/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-03714 | |
03/20/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/28/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 21, 2001. | 01-03714 |