judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JUDY M. WILSON V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-1279
Short Caption:JUDY M. WILSON V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DPW00719-10Filed Date:10/20/2010

Opening Event Date:10/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/15/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJudy M. WilsonNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Dep't of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY
Richard S. LoveNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/20/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/20/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/20/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
10/27/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY
10/28/2010TMC - petitioner's motion for stay - oppo
11/02/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION- to petitioner's motion to stay
11/10/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987). It is *****MORE*****
11/10/2010 F/ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (RDBRNW) (rm)
09/26/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/9/22/10
09/26/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/26/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/06/2011FiledMotion for Leave to File Pro Se Brief and appendix (Petitioner)Granted
12/23/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Pro Se Brief and appendix (Petitioner)
12/23/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
12/23/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Petitioner)
01/20/2012FiledOrder directing motion & brief (Respondent)
01/25/2012FiledAnswer/Response to the court's order 1/20/12 (Respondent)
01/25/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent)Granted
01/26/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/23/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/23/2012FiledAffirmed
05/15/2012FiledMandate