judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE CANCELLATION DEED FROM LEWEN BILL STREET, a/k/a LEWEN B. STREET, JR. v. WILLIAM CLARK STREET; JACQUELINE LOUISE MENKE; and JONATHAN RAY MENKE

Case Heading (S-08-0107)
Case Number:S-08-0107Case Docketed On:05/22/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE CANCELLATION DEED FROM LEWEN BILL STREET, a/k/a LEWEN B. STREET, JR. v. WILLIAM CLARK STREET; JACQUELINE LOUISE MENKE; and JONATHAN RAY MENKE
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE CANCELLATION DEED FROM LEWEN BILL STREET, a/k/a LEWEN B. STREET, JR., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. WILLIAM CLARK STREET; JACQUELINE LOUISE MENKE; and JONATHAN RAY MENKE, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLewen Bill Street Jr.Patrick Dixon
AppelleeWilliam Clark StreetCameron S. Walker
AppelleeJacqueline Louise MenkeCameron S. Walker
AppelleeJonathan Ray MenkeCameron S. Walker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real
Opinion Number:2009 WY 85
Citation:211 P.3d 495

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/22/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/22/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/08/2008Brief - Appellant, and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
07/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant, appendex to brief and statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/25/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/26/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellees; and copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/29/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/04/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/16/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/16/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Deposition.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/03/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two additional volumes. Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed (additional volumes)Notice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/01/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/17/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/21/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/20/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal