Case: 04-81-00115-CR
04-81-00115-CR
09/01/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Urdiales, Fernando
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/08/1994 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
04/20/1994 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
07/12/1983 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
07/08/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/08/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/23/1983 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/16/1983 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
05/04/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/04/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/02/1982 | Submission | | |
02/02/1982 | Submission | | |
02/02/1982 | Submitted | | |
09/01/1981 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/01/1981 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/01/1981 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/19/1980 | Brief Filed | | |
09/19/1980 | Brief Filed | | |
09/19/1980 | Record Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/02/2013 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
07/08/1983 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Ruben Garcia
17,283
85 years