judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARWOOD VS. MANESS

Case Information: 38237
Short Caption:HARWOOD VS. MANESSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A411876Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/24/2002How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kenneth L. Hall, Esq.--check no., 3138.
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12673
08/08/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. James J. Ream in place and stead of Kenneth L. Hall as counsel for appellant. 01-13358
08/08/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: January 16, 2001. To Court Reporter: JoAnne Orduno. 01-13360
08/08/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-13361
10/29/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-18036
10/31/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Supplement to Appellant's Motion for Enlargment of Time to file Opening Brief. 01-18253
11/02/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Kenneth L. Hall addressed to Court Reporter Orduna regarding transcripts. 01-18382
11/16/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Kenneth L. Hall in place and stead of James J. Ream. 01-19251
11/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. On October 29, 2001, appellant filed a motion for a 120-day extension of time to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. On October 31, 2001, appellant filed a supplement to the motion. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by January 25, 2002. Court reporter Orduna shall file a certified copy of the requested transcript with this court within 20 days from the date of this order. We admonish court reporter Orduna for not fully complying with the procedural rules of this court. 01-19345
12/03/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 16, 2001. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 01-20185
01/17/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/15/02. 02-01182
01/17/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-01183
03/18/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A review of this court's docket reveals that respondent is not represented by counsel. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. In the event respondent does not intend to retain counsel, respondent shall so inform this court in writing within 30 days from the date of this order. 02-04856
05/24/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 18, 2002, we received a letter from respondent. We elect to treat the letter as written notification that respondent will not be retaining counsel to represent him in this appeal. fn1[We note that respondent has not moved for permission to file papers in proper person. This court has not granted such permission on its own motion. Respondent shall not be allowed to file, in proper person, written briefs or papers. NRAP 46(b).] This appeal shall stand submitted for decision on the opening brief and appendix filed by appellant. 02-09162
05/24/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted on the opening brief and appendix filed by appellant.
06/06/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-09871
07/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-10554
07/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 5, 2002. 02-10554