judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: CLAYTON STRAUBE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-08-0106)
Case Number:S-08-0106Case Docketed On:05/21/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: CLAYTON STRAUBE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: CLAYTON STRAUBE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantClayton StraubeKenneth Bert DeCock
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Kristi Marie Radosevich
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 66
Citation:208 P.3d 41

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/21/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/21/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/23/2008Brief - Appellant and copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
06/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/04/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/06/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/25/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/03/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/20/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the Court, Justice Burke filed a dissenting opinion in which Chief Justice Voigt joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/22/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
05/22/2009Affidavit - Attorney fees and costsAffidavitAttorney fees and costsFinal
05/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees & Expenses with Affidavit attachedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
06/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/10/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal