judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BURLEY SANDERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1266
Short Caption:BURLEY SANDERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD6551-10Filed Date:10/09/2010

Opening Event Date:10/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBurley Sanders Y
Gregory A. CotterNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/20/2010FILING FEE - $100 for NOA
10/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
12/10/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo).
12/10/2010RECEIVED Statement Regarding Transcript.
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (163-pgs/tape 8/23/10 proc.)w/cd
12/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/27/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
12/27/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
02/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 4/8/11
02/22/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before April 8, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 10, 2011 (no oppo)
04/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before June 10, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to Aug. 10, 2011
06/24/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 10, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
08/24/2011FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 15 days (Appellant)Granted
09/20/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until September 27, 2011
10/05/2011FiledOrder directing brief and limited appendix of appellant, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
10/06/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)Denied Without Prejudice
10/24/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion to dismiss without prejudice to its renewal accompanied by a statement of appellant pro se and directing statement or brief and limited appendix within 20 days from the date of this order
11/29/2011FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
12/22/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
12/22/2011FiledDismissed
01/13/2012FiledMandate