judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORALES-CASTILLO (ALVARO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 58155
Short Caption:MORALES-CASTILLO (ALVARO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C219624-2Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/11/2011How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/14/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. C219624-2 MORALES-CASTILLO 11-11218
05/05/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days. Order Denying Motion for Modification filed on or about 04/26/2011. 11-13364
05/12/2011Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Order Denying Motion for Modification filed on 04/26/2011. 11-14162
07/21/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 11-22047
08/11/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol. 1. 11-24429
08/11/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
08/15/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED).
09/15/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 11-28127
10/12/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-31313
10/12/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/26/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 19, 2011. 11-31313