judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEWMAR CORP. VS. MCCRARY C/W 59045

Case Information: 58174
Short Caption:NEWMAR CORP. VS. MCCRARY C/W 59045Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:58174*, 59045 Related Case(s): 59045
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A573705Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:04/20/2011 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/04/2012 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/04/2012How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/18/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
04/18/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) A573705 MCCRARY 11-11509
04/18/2011OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Morris Peterson
04/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. 11-11513
04/20/2011Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. 11-11714
04/21/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Morris Peterson. Check No. 31190.
05/10/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 11-13726
05/23/2011Settlement NoticeFiled Notice: ECAR. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge Carolyn Worrell to file Early Case Assessment Report. 11-15083
06/15/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 13, 2011. 11-17770
10/03/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 58174/59045. 11-30026
10/05/2011Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: Consolidate Appeals/No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Nos. 58174/59045. 11-30317
10/20/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 1, 2010; April 14, 2010; January 10, 2011 and January 18 thru 21, 2011. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 11-32501
12/01/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/1/10, 4/14/10, 1/10/11, 1/18/11, 1/19/11, 1/20/11, and 1/21/11. Nos. 58174/59045. 11-36908
01/04/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-00214
01/04/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols 1 & 2. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-00215
01/04/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols 3 thru 5. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-00220
01/04/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols 6 & 7. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-00221
01/04/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols 8 & 9. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-00222
01/04/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 10. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-00223
01/04/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 11. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-00224
02/02/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-03572
03/02/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name. 12-06860
03/06/2012BriefFiled Reply Brief Appellant's Reply Brief 12-07102
03/06/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/23/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar. Nos. 58174/59045. 12-23092
10/30/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, December 4, 2012, @ 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 12-34130
11/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This case is currently scheduled for oral arument on December 4, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel should be prepared to address specific issues. Nos. 58174/59045 12-34587
11/19/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 12-36579
12/04/2012Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. C/W 59045
10/03/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part and reversed in part." Before the Court EN BANC. fn1-[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. Nos. 58174/59045 13-29454
10/28/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 58174/59045. 13-32195
10/28/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 58174/59045.
11/14/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 1, 2013. 13-32195