Case Information: 58173 | |||
Short Caption: | GRAY (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C249169 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Senior Justice Rose for Justice Cherry Senior Justice Shearing for Justice Gibbons | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/08/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/18/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/18/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. C249169 GRAY | 11-11504 | |
05/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 11-13599 | |
06/13/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | 11-17518 | |
06/13/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision, on Record. | ||
06/16/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. (SEALED) Pre-Sentence Investigation Report. | ||
07/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record due: 40 days | 11-21092 | |
08/02/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested supplemental transcripts per court order dated 7/14/11 were delivered. Dates of transcripts: March 5, 2009. | 11-23246 | |
08/08/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Supplemental Vol 1 (per court order dated 7/14/11). | 11-23759 | |
08/08/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/05/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2[The Honorables Robert Rose and Miriam Shearing, Senior Justices, participated in the decision of this matter under general orders of assignment.] | 11-30386 | |
11/01/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-33601 | |
11/01/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/15/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 8, 2011. | 11-33601 |