Administrative Case: ADKT 0219 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: SCR 250 CAPITAL SENTENCES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Classification: | Administrative - ADKT - ADKT | Case Status: | Case Closed |
Filed Date: | 08/30/1995 | Public Hearing: | 04/16/1999 at 10:00 AM (Carson City) |
Closed Date: | 12/21/1999 |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/30/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Petition. | 95-00040 | |
11/03/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Appointing Study Committee. | 95-00041 | |
04/09/1996 | Administrative Case | Filed Letter from Judge Fondi stating that a report will be submitted by the committee by May 1, 1996. Copies of the minutes of the Fondi Death Penalty Commission on 12/15/95 and 1/26/96 attached to letter. | 96-00080 | |
07/24/1997 | Administrative Case | Filed Final Report of the Fondi Commission on Death Penalty Cases. | 97-00064 | |
01/12/1998 | Administrative Case | Filed Minority Report of the Fondi Commission on Death Penalty Cases. | 98-00669 | |
01/26/1998 | Administrative Case | Filed Minority Report of the Fondi Commission on Death Penalty Cases with original signatures. | 98-00670 | |
12/30/1998 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 250 (Exhibits A and B attached). Effective 30 days from the date of this order. ADKT 219, 260, 261. | 98-00671 | |
12/30/1998 | Administrative Case | Issued Notice to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer. | ||
03/24/1999 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Scheduling Public Hearing on Letter Submitted by Richard A. Gammick. To be held April 16, 1999 at 10:00 a.m. Written comments may be submitted. | 99-13540 | |
04/16/1999 | Administrative Case | Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Nos. 219, 260, 261. | ||
12/21/1999 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 250(2); 250(4); and 250(9). Effective 30 days from the date of this order. ADKT 219, 260, 261. | 99-13543 | |
12/21/1999 | Administrative Case | Issued Notice to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer. | ||
12/21/1999 | Administrative Case | Case Closed. |