Case: B-3822
B-3822
02/05/1973
Application for Writ of Error
AUSTIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
CITY OF SUNSET VALLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/13/1973 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | | |
06/26/1973 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
05/24/1973 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/13/1973 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
02/20/1973 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/05/1973 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/14/1973 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
11/14/1973 | Opinion issued | | ||
09/13/1973 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
06/26/1973 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
06/13/1973 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/29/1973 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
05/24/1973 | Motion for Rehearing | Filing granted | | |
03/13/1973 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
02/20/1973 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/05/1973 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
02/05/1973 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CITY OF SUNSET VALLEY | Respondent | |
Austin Independent School District | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information