Case Information: 58190 | |||
Short Caption: | FRIMMEL (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 61487 , 73322 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C231369 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/16/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/20/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/20/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. FRIMMEL - C231369-2 | 11-11794 | |
05/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 11-13610 | |
06/16/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on June 9, 2011. | 11-17964 | |
06/16/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol. 1 | 11-17972 | |
06/16/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision | ||
06/16/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 2. | 11-17973 | |
06/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED). | ||
09/30/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn5[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude that appellant is only entitled to the relief describe herein.] | 11-29858 | |
10/25/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-32897 | |
10/25/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
11/01/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On October 11, 2011, this court received a proper person motion for the appointment of counsel. This court denies the motion. | 11-33528 | |
11/04/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 2, 2011. | 11-32897 |