Case Information: 58192 | |||
Short Caption: | ALLEN VS. VESTIN REALTY MORTGAGE II, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48197 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A524701 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Pickering | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/27/2011 / Roitman, Howard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/20/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | ||
04/20/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) VESTIN VS. ALLEN - A524701 | 11-11818 | |
04/20/2011 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Morris Peterson | ||
04/20/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | 11-11820 | |
04/25/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Chasey Honodel. Check No. 1142. | ||
04/27/2011 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. | 11-12411 | |
05/10/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 11-13893 | |
05/31/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9/14/11 | 11-15816 | |
06/15/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Dismiss. | 11-17858 | |
06/17/2011 | Settlement Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal/Stipulation/Settlement. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. | 11-18084 |