Case Information: 58177 | |||
Short Caption: | LEWIS (JAMES) VS. STATE C/W 58178 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 58177*, 58178 | Related Case(s): | 58178 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0837009 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/18/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | ||
04/18/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to all counsel.) | 11-11556 | |
04/18/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-11559 | |
04/25/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Recorder. Teresa Seevers stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/14/2009, 04/30/2010, 02/25/2011, and 03/25/2011. | 11-12171 | |
04/29/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 08/14/2009, 04/30/2010, 02/25/2011, and 03/25/2011. Court Reporter: Lisa Lloyd. District court file stamp is illegible. | 11-12715 | |
05/31/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 11-15899 | |
05/31/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 11-15908 | |
05/31/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Transmit Under Seal Presentence Investigation Report. | 11-15910 | |
06/02/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Presentence Investigation Report due: 20 days. | 11-16162 | |
06/03/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 11-16378 | |
06/08/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED). | ||
06/24/2011 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed. | ||
09/14/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition purposes only. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." Nos. 58177/58178 | 11-27945 | |
10/10/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur Nos. 58177\58178. | 11-30937 | |
10/10/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/17/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 13, 2011. Nos. 58177/58178 | 11-30937 |