Case Information: 58187 | |||
Short Caption: | MCKNIGHT VS. STEP ONE, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54882 , 58695 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0801921 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/20/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. | ||
04/20/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 11-11745 | |
04/27/2011 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 11-12463 | |
04/27/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 11-12464 | |
05/05/2011 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 11-13336 | |
05/23/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 11-15102 | |
06/08/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to proper person appellant McKnight. The court will take no action on the document you submitted (Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court). | 11-16810 | |
06/17/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-18052 | |
06/17/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
06/28/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 24, 2011. | 11-18052 |