Case Information: 58186 | |||
Short Caption: | CISNEROS (MAXIMILLIANO) VS. SKOLNIK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46840 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0500284C | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/28/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/20/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/20/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Notice of Appeal | 11-11728 | |
05/17/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-14535 | |
06/15/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. | 11-17748 | |
06/24/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney Daniel J. Albregts as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant's Notice of Appearance due: 60 days. fn1[The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received via E-Flex on June 15, 2011.] | 11-18874 | |
06/24/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | 11-18875 | |
07/11/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. | 11-20637 | |
10/04/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 11-30206 | |
10/07/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Sheet. | 11-30822 | |
12/28/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vols 1 thru 4. | ||
12/28/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk - Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED). | ||
12/28/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/23/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record due: 30 days. | 12-09292 | |
03/28/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries -Updated Docket Sheet. | 12-09811 | |
04/11/2012 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Pamela Longoni stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/18/11. | 12-11621 | |
04/12/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Updated Docket Entries. | 12-11718 | |
04/12/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Updated Docket Entries. | 12-11719 | |
04/13/2012 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Supplemental Record on Appeal. | ||
07/25/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP. | 12-23424 | |
08/20/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-26047 | |
08/20/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
08/27/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 21, 2012. | 12-26047 |